Kumar, Ganraj (CPSO#: 19675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McGill University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
7720 Markham Rd,
Markham ON  L3S 3K1
Phone: (905) 554-7333
Fax: (905) 554-3077
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

4515 Ebenezer Road Unit 113
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Canada
Phone: 905 794 4088
Fax: 905 794 4259
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

12637 Tenth Line
Stouffville ON  L3B 1A8
Canada
Phone: 905 591 6060
Fax: 905 591 6090
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Trinity Medical Imaging/ Cardiology
1255 The Queensway Unit 16A
Etobicoke, ON: M8Z 1S1
Toronto ON  M8Z 1S1
Canada
Phone: (416) 253-5111
Fax: (416) 253-5112
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1S3
Canada
Phone: 416 848 9795
Fax: 416 521 7216
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ganraj Kumar, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kumar ( CPSO# 19675 )

Business Address:
3 - 7720 Markham Road
Markham ON  L3S 3K1
Phone Number: (905) 554-7333

Business Address:
113 - 4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7

Business Address:
12637 Thenth Line
Stouffville ON  L3B 1A8

Business Address:
Suite 16A
1255 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1S1
Phone Number: (416) 253-5111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GANRAJ KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Mar 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1984