Kumar, Nagappan (CPSO#: 71868)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Madras, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999