Kumar, Paninjukunnath Ravi (CPSO#: 73965)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010