Kumar, Pawan Prabhat (CPSO#: 83057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:University of Bombay, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone: (705) 472-2646
Fax: (705) 476-6543
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pawan Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kumar ( CPSO# 83057 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone Number: (705) 472-2646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAWAN PRABHAT KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 23 Aug 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014