Kumar, Pomilla (CPSO#: 50395)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 30 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: Chhabra, Pomilla (used until: 02 Jun 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997