Kumar, Rajeev (CPSO#: 69522)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 2005