Kumar, Rakesh (CPSO#: 60947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjab University India, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (905) 417-1030
Fax: (905) 417-6030
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rakesh Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumar ( CPSO# 60947 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (905) 412-1030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1990