Kumar, Sameer (CPSO#: 77817)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: (416) 242-1025
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEER KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2008