Kumar, Vijay (CPSO#: 54747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 674-1499
Fax: (705) 671-3649
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

408 2009 lONG lAKE ROAD
Sudbury ON  P3E6C3
Canada
Phone: 7056741499
Fax: 7056713649
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vijay Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kumar ( CPSO# 54747 )

Business Address:
408 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 674-1499

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIJAY KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1984
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1985