Kumaranayake, Viola Marie Celine (CPSO#: 33723)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ceylon, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005