Kumbhare, Dinesh Arun (CPSO#: 59338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto Rehab- University Centre
Suite 7 131
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dinesh Kumbhare Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kumbhare ( CPSO# 59338 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Rehab - University Centre
Suite 7 131
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DINESH ARUN KUMBHARE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMBHARE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989