Kumra, Rajiv (CPSO#: 59902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3832 Bloor St West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1L1
Phone: (416) 231-0007
Fax: (416) 981-7991
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajiv Kumra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 10 2008


Corporation Name: R. Kumra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2009


Corporation Name: R. Kumra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kumra ( CPSO# 59902 )

Business Address:
510 Trethewey Drive
Toronto ON  M6M 4C2

Business Address:
Unit 5A
5230 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M9B 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 231-7300

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV KUMRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 May 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 16 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Suspension of registration imposed: Board of Inquiry Effective: 21 Jun 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 May 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 10 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 11 Nov 2011

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jul 2009
Summary:

On July 15, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kumra committed an act of 
professional misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of 
medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Kumra, with the support of his physician, applied for disability benefits under several 
insurance policies from 2001 through 2005. As a result, he did receive some benefits. In fact, 
during various periods of time in which he represented that he was incapacitated, Dr. Kumra had 
worked as a locum for his physician, had been engaged in a residency program, and had worked 
as a family physician in California. Dr. Kumra made false representations regarding his capacity 
to function as a physician and also authorized his physician to do so on his behalf. 
 
On October 27, 2009, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Kumra's certificate of registration for a period of six months, 
      effective immediately. 
 
2.    The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Kumra's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      (i)   Dr. Kumra shall enroll in and complete the College's Medical Ethics and Informed 
            Consent course, at his own expense, at the earliest available date, and in any 
            event, within six months of the date of this Order. This condition is to be removed 
            upon Dr. Kumra providing the College with satisfactory proof of his completion 
            of the course. 
 
3.    Dr. Kumra shall appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
4.    Dr. Kumra shall pay costs to the College in the amount of $25,550, within 12 months of 
      the date of this Order. 
 
On October 27, 2009, Dr. Kumra appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the 
Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers 
Procedure Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee was stayed pending the outcome of the 
appeal. 
 
On May 10, 2011, the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court) dismissed the appeal.   
Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect. 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 10 May 2011
Hearing Date(s): Jul 15, 2009