Kunashko, Peter Gregory (CPSO#: 55772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871 Ext. 2281
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

353 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Canada
Phone: (519) 759-6089
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 752-8904
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Kunashko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kunashko ( CPSO# 55772 )

Business Address:
CML Imaging
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 752-8904

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
CML Imaging
353 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 759-6089

Business Address:
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone Number: (519) 759-7734

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GREGORY KUNASHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNASHKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1986