Kundhal, Kiran Kaur (CPSO#: 76388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga and Queensway sites
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 102C
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 622-4762
Fax: (416) 622-4763
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue East
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Kundhal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kundhal ( CPSO# 76388 )

Business Address:
75 Watline Avenue
Suites 121 and 125
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3E5
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
Trillium Health Care Centre
Mississauga Site & Queensway Site
100 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
102C- 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 622-4762

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRAN KAUR KUNDHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNDHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2005