Kundu, Sanjoy (CPSO#: 68121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Vein Institute of Toronto
217 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M5R 1J3
Phone: (416) 929-0834
Fax: (416) 929-0392
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P2E5
Canada
Phone: 416-431-8107
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2025 Midland Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1P-2E5
Canada
Phone: 4162961911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

217 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M5R 1J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 929-0834
Fax: (416) 929-0392
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kundu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )

Business Address:
217 Davenport Road
Toronto ON  M5R 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 929-0834

Business Address:
Suite 200
2025 Midland Avenue
Toronto ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 296-3911

Business Address:
Suite 100
5 Fairview Mall Drive
Toronto ON  M2J 2Z1

Business Address:
Room LL04
4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 293-5940


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJOY KUNDU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNDU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999