Kung, Rose Carmela (CPSO#: 56800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite B728
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5036
Fax: (416) 480-5050
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSE CARMELA KUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987