Kung, Tabitha Nancy (CPSO#: 83154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etherington Hall
Room 2004
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-3230
Fax: (613) 533-3244
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 14 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TABITHA NANCY KUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009