Kupets, Rachel Susan (CPSO#: 66252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2 001
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4378
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rachel Kupets Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kupets ( CPSO# 66252 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2-001 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M3N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL SUSAN KUPETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPETS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 1993 to 07 Apr 1993
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 1995 to 05 Apr 1995
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 1996 to 26 Apr 1996
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 16 May 1996 to 20 Jun 1996
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 03 Sep 1996 to 06 Oct 1996
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999