Kupferszmidt, Irene (CPSO#: 13337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:First Moscow Order of Lenin Medical Inst, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2000