Kuraishi, Aqdas Sarfaraz (CPSO#: 28073)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004