Kuriakose, Binny Cyriac (CPSO#: 59937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 23
5929 Jeanne D'Arc Blvd South
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Phone: (613) 749-5421
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

502-1355 Bank Sreet
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-2037
Fax: (613) 738-9097
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Binny Kuriakose Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kuriakose ( CPSO# 59937 )

Business Address:
23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc Boulevard South
Ottawa ON  K1C 6V8
Phone Number: (613) 749-5421

Business Address:
502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1G 8K7
Phone Number: (613) 738-2037

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BINNY CYRIAC KURIAKOSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAKOSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989