Kurian, Annie (CPSO#: 83097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Lille II, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400 Ext. 7201
Fax: 5193837274
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Kurian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kurian ( CPSO# 83097 )

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNIE KURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 25 Aug 2005
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009