Kurisko, Stanley Douglas (CPSO#: 59491)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Iowa
USA - Minnesota
USA - Nebraska
USA - North Dakota
USA - South Dakota
USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2016