Kuriya, Anita (CPSO#: 105257)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of OBGYN
McMaster University Medical Center
2F-39
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 76696
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA KURIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURIYA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2015 to 25 Jan 2015
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 26 Jan 2015 to 06 Feb 2015
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016