Kurosu, Catherine Jean (CPSO#: 62453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: Brown, Catherine Jean (used until: 01 May 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
417-G Uluniu St
Kailua HI  96734
United States
Phone: (808) 366-3985

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Hawaii

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE JEAN KUROSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUROSU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1991