Kursell, Paul Herbert (CPSO#: 63750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medical Centre
387 Cedar Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2J2
Phone: (519) 426-4821
Fax: (519) 426-6649
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Kursell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kursell ( CPSO# 63750 )

Business Address:
387 Cedar Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 2J2
Phone Number: (519) 426-4210

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL HERBERT KURSELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURSELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1992