Kurucz, James Frank (CPSO#: 63246)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Nov 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1002 Byronmanor Rd
London ON  N6K 5B1
Phone: (519) 686-4110
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FRANK KURUCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUCZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1990