Kuruvilla, Mridul Mathew (CPSO#: 86413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Imaging
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (647) 456-2917
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathew Kuruvilla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuruvilla ( CPSO# 86413 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Imaging
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (647) 456-2917

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MRIDUL MATHEW KURUVILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUVILLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2012 to 18 Nov 2012
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2012