Kuruvilla, Philip George (CPSO#: 57307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Oncology Clinic
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-6542
Fax: (905) 494-6416
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1A Conestoge Drive 200
Brampton ON  L6Z4N5
Canada
Phone: 905-703-8320
Fax: 289-752-4335
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Kuruvilla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kuruvilla ( CPSO# 57307 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-6542

Business Address:
200 - 1A Conestoga Drive
Brampton ON  L6Z 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 703-8320

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE KURUVILLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUVILLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1988