Kurz, Christine Jeanette (CPSO#: 85748)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 17 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 31 Mar 2007
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008