Kusniec, Fabio (CPSO#: 70817)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998