Kuszewski, Peter David (CPSO#: 89315)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Kuszewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kuszewski ( CPSO# 89315 )

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER DAVID KUSZEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUSZEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2013