Kutcher, Rodoslav Walter William (CPSO#: 54268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 721-3344
Fax: (705) 721-5522
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walter Kutcher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kutcher ( CPSO# 54268 )

Business Address:
Suite 301 & LL1
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 721-3344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODOSLAV WALTER WILLIAM KUTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUTCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985