Kutcher, Stanley Paul (CPSO#: 31691)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Apr 2005