Kuzmina, Alona (CPSO#: 91335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Charles Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3V7
Phone: (905) 235-4623
Fax: (905) 235-4261
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alona Kuzmina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kuzmina ( CPSO# 91335 )

Business Address:
21 Charles Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 235-4623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALONA KUZMINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUZMINA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011