Kuzon, Jr., William Michael (CPSO#: 51008)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Rochester, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Apr 2006