Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kvas, Richard Gordon (CPSO#: 63985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208 - 101 Mall
38 Pine Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone: (705) 264-5111
Fax: (705) 267-4212
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Kvas & Dr. Lynne Schwertfeger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kvas ( CPSO# 63985 )
Dr. L. Schwertfeger ( CPSO# 63890 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
38 Pine Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone Number: (705) 264-5111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD GORDON KVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KVAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992