Kvern, Brent Lionel (CPSO#: 56627)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1990