Kwamie, Yosef Kwaku (CPSO#: 51009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Lakeridge Health Corporation Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-2206
Fax: (905) 721-4742
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yosef Kwamie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kwamie ( CPSO# 51009 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation Oshawa
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-2206

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOSEF KWAKU KWAMIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAMIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2005

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Dec 1992
Summary:

 In December 1992, Dr. Kwamie pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act 
 relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline 
 Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Kwamie guilty of professional misconduct.  The 
 Committee agreed to a joint submission as to penalty, and consequently imposed the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr. Kwamie was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register.

2.	Dr. Kwamie was to pay a fine in the amount of $5000.00 within thirty days of 
 this Order becoming final.

3.	Dr. Kwamie(s licence to practice was to be suspended for a period 
 of three months.

4.	Should Dr. Kwamie be the subject of subsequent Discipline proceedings, the 
 record of this proceeding was to form part of such proceedings.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 14 Dec 1992