Kwan, Anthony Lup-Kay (CPSO#: 73394)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2015