Kwan, Christina Yee (CPSO#: 90740)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wellington Medical Clinic
1221 Wellington Street West
Ottawa ON  K1Y 2Z9
Phone: (613) 695-1221
Fax: (613) 695-1321
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christina Y. Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kwan ( CPSO# 90740 )

Business Address:
Wellington Medical Clinic
1221 Wellington Street West
Ottawa ON  K1Y 2Z9
Phone Number: (613) 695-1221

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA YEE KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011