Kwan, Jason Chee-Wai (CPSO#: 108482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  28 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
404-8333 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 856-6136
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 May 2016 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Jason Chee-Wai Kwan may practise family medicine at 8333 Weston Road,
                  in Woodbridge, Ontario and 9275 Bayview Avenue in Richmond Hill, Ontario,
                  while  under  supervision  coordinated  by a supervisor acceptable to the
                  College.

            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically  expires  on  January  28,
                  2019.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Kwan's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required reports to the College  by  the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Kwan's practice.
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on January 29, 2016,  and  will  expire  on or
                  before January 28, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.