Kwan, Keith Fee (CPSO#: 61964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
337 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 36358
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas


Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KEITH FEE KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992