Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kwan, Lawrence Wai-On (CPSO#: 62287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 412
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 321-3322
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kwan ( CPSO# 62287 )

Business Address:
412 - 4910 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 321-3322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE WAI-ON KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1991