Kwan, Manbun (CPSO#: 65254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medical Clinic
Suite 200
51A Underhill Drive
Toronto ON  M3A 2J8
Phone: (416) 391-5155
Fax: (416) 391-5286
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manbun Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kwan ( CPSO# 65254 )

Business Address:
200 - 51A Underhill Drive
Toronto ON  M3A 2J8
Phone Number: (416) 391-5155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANBUN KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993