Kwan, Sarah (CPSO#: 100732)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
214 College Street, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: 416-978-8030
Fax: 416-971-2089
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor, 3248 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2L4
Canada
Phone: (416) 335-3376
Fax: (416) 335-3375
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2nd Floor, 607 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M4M 1Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-7547
Fax: (416) 461-7548
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015