Kwan, Terry (CPSO#: 69061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 402
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-8159
Fax: (905) 272-1043
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-2110
Fax: (416) 521-2220
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kwan ( CPSO# 69061 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B1
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 521-2100

Business Address:
Suite 402
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-8159

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999