Kwan, Wing Hong (CPSO#: 54199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Department of Nuclear Medicine
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-4334
Fax: (905) 721-4762
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 372-6811 Ext. 3844
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Nuclear Medicine Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Ext. 3339
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Suite 101
7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (416) 628-4020
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael W. H. Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Kwan ( CPSO# 54199 )

Business Address:
101 - 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (416) 728-9089

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WING HONG KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985