Kwan, Winkle Bing Chung (CPSO#: 65702)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2001