Kwan, Yunxin (CPSO#: 100454)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Apr 2013 to 22 Jul 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013